U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Davis v. University of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • December 04, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 30, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 30, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 27, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 20, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 13, 2018: [Witness List]
  • November 13, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 13, 2018: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • November 13, 2018: [In Limine]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 25, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 18, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Hearing - Dispositive]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 27, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • September 14, 2018: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • September 12, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • September 05, 2018: [Response]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Appeal of Magistrate Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 16, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • August 13, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 09, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Reply to Response]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 26, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 17, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 16, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • July 16, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 11, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Compel]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Protective Order]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • November 14, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • October 10, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 21, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • June 21, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 15, 2017: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 14, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • June 07, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 07, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 30, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • May 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 18, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 28, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.