U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00061
  • Case Name: First Interstate Bank v. Cross et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • September 17, 2018: [Vacate]
  • September 17, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Status Report Order]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Status Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Status Report Order]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Status Report]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Status Report Order]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Consolidating Case]
  • June 16, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • June 13, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • May 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 23, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 16, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 03, 2017: [Brief]
  • May 03, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2017: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • May 03, 2017: [Default Judgment]
  • May 02, 2017: [Brief]
  • May 02, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 29, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.