U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Matteri v. Campbell County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
  • July 14, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 15, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • April 26, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
  • April 05, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 31, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.