U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00066
  • Case Name: United States of America v. West et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • February 27, 2018: [Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 25, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 16, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 15, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 05, 2017: [Status Conference]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Dismissing Party]
  • May 02, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 06, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 06, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.