U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Isham v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Letter(s)]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 07, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 21, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 06, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.