U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Cheyenne WY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • April 17, 2022: [Payment Entry]
  • April 17, 2022: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • April 05, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 05, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 29, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: [In Limine]
  • March 25, 2022: [Response]
  • March 25, 2022: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • March 25, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 12, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • March 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 25, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 09, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 31, 2022: [Witness List]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 25, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 13, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 12, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • December 01, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Errata]
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 24, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 12, 2021: [Quash]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • October 02, 2020: [Substitute Party]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 21, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 02, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • July 02, 2020: [Reply]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • June 26, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 22, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Joinder-Dispositive]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • June 12, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 11, 2020: [Response]
  • June 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2020: [Stay Discovery]
  • June 08, 2020: [Strike]
  • June 03, 2020: [Joinder - Dispositive]
  • June 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 03, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 02, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 08, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: [Response]
  • April 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 19, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 13, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • March 13, 2020: [Set Aside]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Mandate]
  • March 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 06, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • March 14, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [USCA Order]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • January 19, 2018: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Response]
  • January 04, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 02, 2018: [Letter(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 28, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • December 27, 2017: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • December 21, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 20, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • December 07, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 06, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • September 18, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • September 18, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • September 14, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • September 11, 2017: [Brief]
  • September 11, 2017: [Opposition]
  • September 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 06, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • August 28, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • August 25, 2017: [Errata]
  • August 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 24, 2017: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • August 22, 2017: [Reply]
  • August 21, 2017: [Objection]
  • August 21, 2017: [Supplement]
  • August 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2017: [Brief]
  • August 15, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 08, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 08, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 04, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 02, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 01, 2017: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • August 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 25, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 21, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 17, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 12, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 07, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 07, 2017: [Brief]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • June 19, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Joinder]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 23, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 19, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 18, 2017: [Brief]
  • May 18, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 17, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 15, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 11, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 10, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2017: [Status Report]
  • April 17, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 17, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.