U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Treatments Resource Group Inc v. Got Calls? Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2018: [Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2017: [Reply to Response]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Opposition]
  • June 22, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • June 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2017: [Set Aside]
  • June 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 16, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 14, 2017: [Dismiss Party]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 23, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 19, 2017: [Entry of Default]
  • May 12, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.