U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Tri County Telephone Association Inc v. Campbell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [USCA Order]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • October 06, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • October 06, 2020: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • September 22, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 18, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • September 18, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Response]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [USCA Order]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • August 15, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 15, 2019: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • August 15, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Supersedeas Bond Received]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • July 11, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 10, 2019: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 02, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 02, 2019: [Objection]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 22, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 21, 2019: [Setting Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Strike]
  • May 20, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Reply]
  • May 09, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 03, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 01, 2019: [Compel]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 29, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 29, 2019: [Compel]
  • April 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 12, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • April 02, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continue (Dispositive)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 29, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 22, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 21, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 04, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • October 09, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • October 02, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 07, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 05, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Status Conference]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • May 25, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 15, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • April 02, 2018: [Reply Brief]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 26, 2018: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • March 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 06, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 02, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 21, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 21, 2018: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Stay Case]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 02, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 12, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 27, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 27, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 19, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 15, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • July 17, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 11, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • July 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 28, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • June 20, 2017: [Disqualify]
  • June 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 31, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 26, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • May 26, 2017: [Complaint]
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.