U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Rhodes et al v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [USCA Order]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 05, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 16, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • November 16, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 20, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Letter(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.