U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Wood v. BP America Production Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 15, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2018
  • May 28, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 14, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • May 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 14, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 30, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 12, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Designation]
  • March 30, 2018: [Witness List]
  • March 22, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 15, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 10, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 10, 2017: [Protective Order]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 21, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 21, 2017: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 20, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 20, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • July 20, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • June 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 14, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 14, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.