U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Chavis v. Division of Criminal Investigations Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • June 26, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 26, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 26, 2017: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
  • June 20, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • June 15, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • June 15, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 15, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 15, 2017: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.