U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Child v. Ginsberg
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 10, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 05, 2018: [Witness List]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 31, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Status Report]
  • February 13, 2018: [Status Report Order]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Entry of Default]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • August 28, 2017: [Intervene]
  • August 11, 2017: [Alias Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2017: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 03, 2017: [Praecipe]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • June 20, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.