U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Alcorn v. La Barge WY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 27, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • September 13, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • September 06, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 06, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 27, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 20, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 20, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 18, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 17, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 10, 2018: [Reply]
  • August 03, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [In Limine]
  • July 20, 2018: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • July 19, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • July 19, 2018: [Reply]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 11, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 07, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 21, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 12, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 29, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 14, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • September 11, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • June 26, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.