U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Victory Processing LLC et al v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • September 21, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 14, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • September 11, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • September 07, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 06, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 04, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Appendix]
  • August 20, 2018: [Statement]
  • August 20, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 20, 2018: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • August 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • April 20, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • April 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 30, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 19, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 28, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 21, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 26, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.