U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Bird v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 28, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • July 27, 2017: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • July 26, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • July 20, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 19, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 19, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.