U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Wells v. Fremont County Board of County Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • March 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 19, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 16, 2018: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 08, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 08, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 05, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 17, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 29, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 04, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 04, 2017: [Response]
  • December 04, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • November 06, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 03, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 23, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 19, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 17, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 16, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 16, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 12, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 04, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 02, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 02, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 17, 2017: [Acceptance of Service]
  • August 17, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Praecipe]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.