U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00113
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Lain et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [USCA Notification]
  • December 02, 2019: [Supplement]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • May 16, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • April 19, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • April 05, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 05, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • February 20, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 19, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 13, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • February 12, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 12, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Regarding Appeal of Magistrate Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • February 01, 2019: [Appeal of Magistrate Order]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Regarding Appeal of Magistrate Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 14, 2019: [Appeal of Magistrate Order]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 28, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 27, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • December 17, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • December 17, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 14, 2018: [Compel]
  • December 11, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 11, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • December 11, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Intervene]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order]
  • November 29, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 19, 2018: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • November 19, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • November 19, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 09, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • November 09, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 30, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 29, 2018: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Application]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • May 21, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order]
  • May 21, 2018: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 01, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 17, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • April 17, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 10, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • April 03, 2018: [Reply]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • March 07, 2018: [Response]
  • March 07, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 01, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 01, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • March 01, 2018: [Objection]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Reply to Response]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • September 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 29, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 29, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.