U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Decoteau v. BNSF Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 21, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • January 04, 2018: [Status Conference]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • December 04, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 05, 2017: [Financial Entry]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 03, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 03, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 03, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 20, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 12, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 12, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.