U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Schwen et al v. Uyttersprot
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 16, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 10, 2018: [Vacate]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 18, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 07, 2018: [Mail Returned]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • January 24, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • January 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Status Report]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 11, 2017: [Stay Case]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • November 28, 2017: [Brief]
  • November 28, 2017: [Set Aside]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 25, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 24, 2017: [Entry of Default]
  • October 10, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 02, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.