U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Blanchard v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 29, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 28, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • March 26, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • March 08, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 08, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 20, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 09, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Response]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 02, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Opposition]
  • January 25, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • January 25, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • January 16, 2018: [Reply]
  • January 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 16, 2018: [Leave to]
  • January 08, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • January 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 28, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 04, 2017: [Reply]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 07, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 03, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 02, 2017: [Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 20, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 20, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • October 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 17, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 17, 2017: [Opposition]
  • October 15, 2017: [Errata]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2017: [Response]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Response]
  • October 09, 2017: [Objection]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 02, 2017: [Reply]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 20, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 19, 2017: [Request for Hearing]
  • September 19, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • September 18, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 18, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • September 08, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 05, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • September 01, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Opposition]
  • August 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 29, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 29, 2017: [Opposition]
  • August 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 17, 2017: [Certify Class]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 16, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 26, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • July 26, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 20, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 19, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.