U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00126
  • Case Name: Flickinger et al v. FCA US LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 06, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 14, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 14, 2018: [Status Report]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 15, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 14, 2017: [Leave to]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Protective Order]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Vacating Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • October 03, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 21, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 21, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 12, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 12, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 30, 2017: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • August 29, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 24, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 24, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.