U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Milcor I LLC v. Riverton Community Development Building Official Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 23, 2018: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • January 23, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 03, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 03, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 03, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 04, 2017: [In Limine]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 20, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • October 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 13, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 13, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • October 13, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 12, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 05, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 29, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 12, 2017: [- Ex-Parte Document]
  • September 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 07, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 07, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 06, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 30, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.