U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Buechler et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Receipt for Exhibits]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • November 14, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • October 30, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 29, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • October 26, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 24, 2018: [Reply]
  • October 17, 2018: [Brief]
  • October 12, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • October 03, 2018: [New Trial]
  • October 01, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • September 05, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 05, 2018: [Jury Verdict]
  • September 04, 2018: [Jury Verdict]
  • September 04, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • August 31, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 31, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 31, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • August 31, 2018: [Transcript]
  • August 30, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • August 29, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • August 28, 2018: [Objection]
  • August 28, 2018: [Deposition]
  • August 28, 2018: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • August 28, 2018: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 24, 2018: [Brief]
  • August 24, 2018: [Objection]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [Strike]
  • August 23, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • August 22, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 22, 2018: [Opposition]
  • August 22, 2018: [Strike]
  • August 22, 2018: [Expedite]
  • August 22, 2018: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • August 22, 2018: [In Limine]
  • August 21, 2018: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • August 21, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 21, 2018: [Expedite]
  • August 20, 2018: [Statement]
  • August 20, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 20, 2018: [Proposed Verdict]
  • August 20, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jury Questionnaires]
  • August 17, 2018: [Response]
  • August 16, 2018: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • August 13, 2018: [Designation]
  • August 10, 2018: [In Limine]
  • August 10, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 09, 2018: [Transcript]
  • August 03, 2018: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 13, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • July 12, 2018: [Response]
  • July 05, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 02, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 26, 2018: [Response]
  • June 19, 2018: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • June 19, 2018: [Brief]
  • June 19, 2018: [In Limine]
  • June 19, 2018: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • June 14, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 07, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 06, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 12, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Witness List]
  • March 30, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 25, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 12, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • September 12, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 05, 2017: [Financial Entry]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 24, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 04, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 03, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.