U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Breden et al v. Covenant Transport Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 17, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 15, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 19, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 15, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 06, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Reply Brief]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Reply]
  • January 22, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 22, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 02, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • December 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 14, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 14, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 11, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 25, 2017: [Notice of Complexity]
  • August 15, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • August 15, 2017: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • August 14, 2017: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • August 07, 2017: [Complaint]
  • August 04, 2017: [Removal]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.