U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Millward et al v. Teton County Board of County Commissioners
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 02, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • February 07, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 07, 2019: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • February 07, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • February 05, 2019: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • February 04, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 21, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 17, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [USCA Order]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • November 02, 2018: [Transcript]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Staying Case]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 31, 2018: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 29, 2018: [Strike]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 26, 2018: [Response]
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 22, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 19, 2018: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • October 19, 2018: [In Limine]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 12, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Designation]
  • October 11, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Supplement]
  • October 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2018: [Response]
  • October 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 02, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 01, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 14, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • September 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 12, 2018: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • September 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 12, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Disqualify]
  • September 11, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 05, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 04, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 28, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 27, 2018: [Disqualify]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 17, 2018: [Supplement]
  • August 16, 2018: [In Court Hearing]
  • August 16, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • August 15, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 14, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 10, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 08, 2018: [Status Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • July 26, 2018: [Response]
  • July 23, 2018: [Witness List]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 23, 2018: [Designation]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Reply to Response]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 20, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 13, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • June 07, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 21, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 24, 2018: [Compel]
  • April 24, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Protective Order]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 16, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 09, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Status Conference]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • December 13, 2017: [Intervene]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 06, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 27, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 16, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 05, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 05, 2017: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • September 05, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 29, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 24, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • August 23, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 18, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 08, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • August 08, 2017: [Brief]
  • August 08, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 04, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.