U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00135
  • Case Name: Fritchie v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 16, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [Protective Order]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 28, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 15, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • November 14, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 06, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.