U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Chavis v. Wyoming Division of Criminal Investigation Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Letter(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Letter(s)]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Letter(s)]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Letter(s)]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Closing Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.