U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Capozzoli v State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2018: [Reply]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2018: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2018: [Response]
  • February 13, 2018: [Strike]
  • February 12, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • February 05, 2018: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • February 05, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 05, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • January 02, 2018: [Letter(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • December 14, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 17, 2017: [Martinez Report]
  • October 17, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 15, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 14, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2017: [Requiring Martinez Report]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.