U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Klaczkiewicz v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 12, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • October 09, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 09, 2018: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • October 09, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 22, 2018: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • August 09, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • August 03, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 25, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 25, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 12, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • July 11, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 10, 2018: [Vacate]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 19, 2018: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • June 18, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 11, 2018: [Vacating Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • May 16, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 14, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • May 07, 2018: [Opposition]
  • May 02, 2018: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • May 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 30, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • April 18, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • April 02, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Opposition]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • February 20, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 14, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 14, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 05, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 01, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 26, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 12, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • November 06, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • November 02, 2017: [Recusal]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 21, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • September 12, 2017: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 06, 2017: [Removal]
  • September 01, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 01, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 01, 2017: [Complaint]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.