U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Oliver et al v. Lampert et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 18, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 18, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • January 13, 2022: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2022: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 07, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • January 07, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • January 07, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 27, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 13, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 15, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • October 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • October 15, 2021: [In Limine]
  • October 13, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • October 06, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [In Court Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • August 13, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • August 05, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • July 29, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • July 29, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • July 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 19, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Vacate]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • July 09, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 04, 2021: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • June 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 04, 2021: [Witness List]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 29, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 17, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 03, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 11, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 05, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 05, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 13, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 06, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 03, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • April 03, 2020: [Praecipe]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • March 17, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • January 24, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 24, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 17, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 07, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 29, 2019: [Response]
  • November 15, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • November 14, 2019: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • November 14, 2019: [Stay Case]
  • November 01, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 10, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 05, 2019: [Vacate]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 04, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 04, 2019: [Vacate]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 22, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 20, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 21, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 19, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 07, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Opposition]
  • June 27, 2018: [Reply]
  • June 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 14, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Opposition]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 13, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 26, 2018: [Dismiss]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • January 26, 2018: [Show Cause]
  • January 23, 2018: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • January 22, 2018: [Requiring Service and Response]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 14, 2017: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.