U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Lebo v. Navient Solutions LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 17, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 02, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 01, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 30, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 07, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 09, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 09, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.