U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00156
  • Case Name: Altamirano et al v. General Motors LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 11, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • May 10, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 15, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 07, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 07, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 26, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Protective Order]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 27, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 21, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 14, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 14, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 08, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 06, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 02, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 01, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 01, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 31, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 19, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 25, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Complexity]
  • September 18, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • September 18, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.