U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00170
  • Case Name: American Wild Horse Campaign et al v. United States Department of the Interior Secretary et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 07, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [Stay Case]
  • May 06, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 09, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 02, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • March 25, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 25, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • March 21, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 21, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 21, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 07, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 07, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Objection]
  • February 07, 2019: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • January 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 09, 2019: [Remanding Case to US Agency]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • December 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • December 03, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Response]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 02, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 01, 2018: [Brief]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Brief]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 07, 2018: [Reply]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 17, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • April 11, 2018: [Reply]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 07, 2018: [Compel]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 23, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 29, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 04, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • October 19, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 16, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 12, 2017: [Reply]
  • October 12, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • October 12, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 10, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 10, 2017: [Intervene]
  • October 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 06, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 06, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.