U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00175
  • Case Name: Feinman v. SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • June 10, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 21, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Reconsideration]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 09, 2021: [Reconsideration]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Closing Case]
  • July 10, 2020: [Response]
  • July 10, 2020: [Status Report]
  • July 06, 2020: [Show Cause]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Status Report]
  • April 09, 2020: [Status Report Order]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Status Report]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Status Report]
  • November 04, 2019: [Status Report Order]
July, 2019
  • July 05, 2019: [Status Report]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Status Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Status Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Status Report Order]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Reconsideration]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 05, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 08, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Reply]
  • December 15, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 08, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 04, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 01, 2017: [Compel]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 29, 2017: [Compel]
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • November 17, 2017: [Dismiss Party]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • October 17, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • October 17, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.