U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00181
  • Case Name: Upward Partners-Longmont LLC et al v. Bank of the West
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • January 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Reply Brief]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 14, 2017: [Brief]
  • November 14, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • November 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • November 13, 2017: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • November 10, 2017: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Removal]
  • October 30, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 30, 2017: [Complaint]
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.