U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00182
  • Case Name: Emmett v. Armstrong et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 21, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 02, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 01, 2021: [Vacate]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Reconsideration]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Mandate]
  • September 23, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 27, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 10, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • November 29, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 31, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • October 16, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 15, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • October 15, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 15, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 14, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 14, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order]
  • September 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 14, 2018: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • September 14, 2018: [In Court Hearing]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 06, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 04, 2018: [Reply Brief]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 27, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 27, 2018: [Response]
  • August 20, 2018: [Witness List]
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 14, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 13, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • August 13, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 13, 2018: [In Limine]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 06, 2018: [Reply Brief]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Response]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 17, 2018: [Strike]
  • July 17, 2018: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 09, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 30, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 21, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Protective Order]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 21, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 20, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • November 20, 2017: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • November 16, 2017: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • November 15, 2017: [Removal]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.