U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00183
  • Case Name: AH v. Fremont County School District Number 25
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Dismiss]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 03, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • November 20, 2018: [Stay Case]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • November 14, 2018: [Stay Case]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • October 03, 2018: [Response]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 27, 2018: [Response]
  • September 27, 2018: [Show Cause]
  • September 06, 2018: [Brief]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 02, 2018: [Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.