U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00187
  • Case Name: Simms et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 02, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • October 01, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • September 26, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 26, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Reply Brief]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Brief]
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Brief]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 05, 2018: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • December 05, 2018: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [Brief]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Brief]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 10, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Brief]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 16, 2018: [Vacate]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 23, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 11, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 15, 2018: [Reply]
  • March 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 01, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • March 01, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Brief]
  • February 16, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • February 09, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 08, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Dismissing Party]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 16, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.