U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00190
  • Case Name: Wyoming Sunmade LLC v. Latrobe Specialty Steel Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 07, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 07, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 08, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 05, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 22, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 14, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • November 17, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.