U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Hanson v. Swainston
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 11, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • August 31, 2018: [Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 20, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [In Limine]
  • August 17, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for In Camera Inspections]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • July 27, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 23, 2018: [Brief]
  • July 20, 2018: [In Camera Inspections]
  • July 16, 2018: [Brief]
  • July 03, 2018: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 10, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 10, 2018: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • November 21, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.