U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00194
  • Case Name: Advanced Communications Technology Inc. et al v. Oscar Renda Contracting Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 25, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 18, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 18, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 18, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 16, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 13, 2017: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 11, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 06, 2017: [Jury Demand]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • November 29, 2017: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 28, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 21, 2017: [Removal]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 21, 2017: [Complaint]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.