U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00195
  • Case Name: Grover et al v. Citibank NA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 15, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 14, 2018: [Stay Discovery]
  • June 14, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 10, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 01, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Lift Stay]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Status Report]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • February 08, 2018: [Vacate]
  • February 08, 2018: [Stay Case]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Removal]
  • November 27, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2017: [Answer to Notice of Removal]
  • November 22, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.