U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00196
  • Case Name: Gibson v. Midwest Family Mutual Insurance
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 03, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 04, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.