U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Bird v. Lampert et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 18, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 14, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 27, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • November 27, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 27, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 27, 2017: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.