U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00200
  • Case Name: Siler v. Wyoming Livestock Board et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 26, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 10, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 02, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 26, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 23, 2020: [Response]
  • March 12, 2020: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • March 12, 2020: [In Limine]
  • March 04, 2020: [Reply]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 20, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 10, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 11, 2019: [Request for Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • December 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • July 02, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • May 21, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • May 17, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Opposition]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Opposition]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 02, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 01, 2018: [Brief]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Reply]
  • May 17, 2018: [Opposition]
  • May 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 04, 2018: [Dismiss]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2018: [Response]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 09, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 07, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Reply]
  • February 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 13, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 13, 2018: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 30, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 18, 2018: [Response]
  • January 18, 2018: [Opposition]
  • January 16, 2018: [Complaint]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 11, 2018: [Leave to]
  • January 10, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 08, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • December 01, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.