U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00201
  • Case Name: Dalmut v. Nabors Drilling USA LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 23, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 05, 2018: [Status Report]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Status Report]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Status Report Order]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 08, 2018: [Compel]
  • January 08, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 03, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 03, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 03, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • January 03, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Acceptance of Service]
  • December 08, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 05, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • December 05, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.