U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00202
  • Case Name: WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT et al v. TIDWELL et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 12, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 24, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 24, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 22, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 17, 2019: [Stay Case]
  • January 17, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 19, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 18, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • December 17, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 13, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 11, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • December 10, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 27, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 26, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 14, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 13, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • September 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2018: [Memorandum & Opinion]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • July 12, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Response]
  • June 14, 2018: [Brief]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 11, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 11, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Brief]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [Brief]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 09, 2018: [Brief]
  • May 09, 2018: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 08, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2018: [Brief]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 21, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 11, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • December 18, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 13, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 13, 2017: [Intervene]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 12, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 05, 2017: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • December 05, 2017: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.