U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00203
  • Case Name: Bitterman v. Wiebe
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 20, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 10, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 02, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 03, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 16, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 07, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2018
  • January 15, 2018: [Jury Demand]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 11, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.