U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Warren v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Brief]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Trial Brief]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Set Aside]
  • July 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2018: [Dismissing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Response]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • February 28, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • February 26, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 12, 2017: [Complaint and Petition-Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.