U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00206
  • Case Name: Bray et al v. United States Government
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • July 17, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 06, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 06, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 06, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 05, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Brief]
  • May 15, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Brief]
  • March 06, 2018: [Objection]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Brief]
  • February 13, 2018: [Dismiss]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • January 05, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • January 04, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 28, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • December 21, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.